MN HF2806 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Author added Hornstein and Baker.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Author added Hornstein and Baker.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alzheimer's Disease Awareness Day designated.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease Awareness Day designated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Author added Hornstein and Baker. |
2016-03-14 | House | Authors added Youakim and Bly. |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2685 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Second reading