MN HF2802 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 148
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulatory certainty provided to municipalities that construct publicly owned treatment works to comply with new or modified effluent limitations.
Title
Regulatory certainty provided to municipalities that construct publicly owned treatment works to comply with new or modified effluent limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 83 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 84 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 83 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 84 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 148 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-26 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2807 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2807, now on General Orders |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-08 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 83-44 |
2018-05-08 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-05-08 | House | Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Gruenhagen. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2807 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2802