MN HF2788 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Pardons provisions modified, Clemency Review Commission established, report required, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Pardons provisions modified, Clemency Review Commission established, report required, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy
2023-03-20HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2023-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2023-03-09HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2908 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Author added Oumou Verbeten

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback