MN HF2785 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voyageurs National Park clean water project funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Voyageurs National Park clean water project funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Capital Investment