MN HF2781 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Ecklund.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Slide-fire stock for a semiautomatic firearm clarified as a trigger activator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Slide-fire stock for a semiautomatic firearm clarified as a trigger activator.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseAuthor added Ecklund.
2018-03-26HouseAuthor added Masin
2018-03-05HouseAuthor added Youakim.
2018-02-22HouseAuthors added Bly; Lee; Carlson, L.; Freiberg; Hausman; and Schultz.
2018-02-20HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF2601 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Authors added Laine; Cwodzinski

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback