MN HF2768 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Daniels.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Daniels.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child sexual abuse prevention instruction in a health curriculum modified.
Title
Child sexual abuse prevention instruction in a health curriculum modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author added Daniels. |
2018-04-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 19, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2018-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Carlson, L. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Christensen, Grossell, and Maye Quade. |
2018-02-22 | House | Authors added Youakim and Dean, M. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2465 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Second reading