MN HF2735 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota identification card requirements modified and related changes made including eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, discrimination, voter registration, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota identification card requirements modified and related changes made including eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, discrimination, voter registration, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Elkins
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Moran
2019-03-27HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2734 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Author added Torres Ray

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback