MN HF2709 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officer training reimbursement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Peace officer training reimbursement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF3947 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy