MN HF2705 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Omar.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Omar.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Harriet Tubman Center West funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Harriet Tubman Center West funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author added Omar. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Jurgens. |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Lee. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Poston. |
2017-05-21 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2017-05-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2420 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Author stricken Schoen