MN HF2701 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Author added Long
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Author added Long
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
First Amendment; a resolution memorializing Congress to overturn Supreme Court decision Citizens United v. FEC, clarification required from Congress that rights protected are rights of natural persons and not artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not protected under First Amendment, and Congress asked to provide clarification in constitutional amendment.
Title
First Amendment; a resolution memorializing Congress to overturn Supreme Court decision Citizens United v. FEC, clarification required from Congress that rights protected are rights of natural persons and not artificial entities and that spending money to influence elections is not protected under First Amendment, and Congress asked to provide clarification in constitutional amendment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | House | Author added Long |
2020-05-09 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2020-05-04 | House | Author added Schultz |
2020-04-30 | House | Author added Moran |
2020-04-28 | House | Authors added Pinto, Acomb, and Sandell |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-02-11 | House | Authors added Vang, Lesch, Cantrell, Christensen, Bierman, Davnie, Persell, Her, Hausman, and Bahner |
2019-05-10 | House | Authors added Noor and Olson |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Hansen |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2038 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Author added Dibble