MN HF2695 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Commerce Department licensee education requirements modified.
Title
Commerce Department licensee education requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] |
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Sen. Vicki Jensen [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 249 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-13 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-06 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 125-0 |
2014-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-06 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-05-06 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 56-0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2178 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2178, now on General Orders |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-24 | House | Bill was passed vote: 132-0 |
2014-04-24 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-22 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 24, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |