MN HF2687 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Bahr, C.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Bahr, C.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public waters and public drainage system laws clarified.
Title
Public waters and public drainage system laws clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Bahr, C. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Jessup. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added West |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2419 (Similar To) 2017-05-21 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance