MN HF2682 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Vogel.
Pending: House Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Vogel.
Pending: House Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regent Candidate Advisory Council repealed.
Title
Regent Candidate Advisory Council repealed.
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] | Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] |
Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Vogel. |
2017-05-19 | House | Author added Lien. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2142 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy