MN HF2680 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Lislegard and Sandstede
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Lislegard and Sandstede
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Duluth Armory Arts and Music Center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Duluth Armory Arts and Music Center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Lislegard and Sandstede |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Sundin |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Hornstein, Davids |
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2022-02-01 | House | Authors added Ecklund; Olson, L. |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2641 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Author added Gazelka