MN HF265 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility expanded for discretionary and mandatory expungements for eviction case court files, and public access limited to pending eviction case court actions.
Title
Eligibility expanded for discretionary and mandatory expungements for eviction case court files, and public access limited to pending eviction case court actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Long |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Fischer |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-01-25 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF771 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Authors added Fateh; Marty