MN HF2637 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Author added Klevorn
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19; cultural community rescue restart grant program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; cultural community rescue restart grant program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05HouseAuthor added Klevorn
2022-04-19HouseAuthor added Morrison
2022-04-04HouseAuthor added Schultz
2022-03-28HouseAuthors added Olson, L., and Feist
2022-03-23HouseAuthor added Poston
2022-03-21HouseAuthors added Moller, Hausman, and Boldon
2022-03-17HouseAuthors added Davids; Her; Hollins; Hornstein; Edelson; Hansen, R.; Moran; and Hassan
2022-03-14HouseAuthor added Reyer
2022-02-03HouseAuthor added Pelowski
2021-05-17HouseAuthors added Murphy, Jordan and Xiong, J.
2021-05-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF2551 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Authors added Nelson; McEwen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback