MN HF2625 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Richfield; response time residency requirement for firefighters extended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Richfield; response time residency requirement for firefighters extended.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 81 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-22 Secretary of State Chapter 146
2016-05-22 Governor's action Approval
2016-05-22 Governor approval
2016-05-20 Presented to Governor
2016-05-19HouseReturned from Senate
2016-05-19SenateThird reading Passed vote: 51-4
2016-05-19SenateSpecial Order
2016-05-16SenateSecond reading
2016-05-16SenateComm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2515
2016-05-12SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2515, now on General Orders
2016-05-12SenateIntroduction and first reading
2016-05-12SenateReceived from House
2016-05-11HouseBill was passed vote: 81-49
2016-05-11HouseThird reading
2016-05-09HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 11, 2016
2016-04-18HouseSecond reading
2016-04-18HouseHouse rule 4.30, request to return bill to House
2016-04-18HouseMotion prevailed
2016-04-18HouseMotion to suspend rules
2016-04-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
2016-03-08HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2515 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2625

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback