MN HF2625 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - House: Referred by Chair to Labor and Consumer Protection Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Credit information use prohibited as basis for changing motor vehicle or homeowner's insurance policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credit information use prohibited as basis for changing motor vehicle or homeowner's insurance policies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-25 House: Referred by Chair to Labor and Consumer Protection Division
2010-02-11 House: Author added Laine
2010-02-09 House: Referred by Chair to Labor and Consumer Protection Division
2010-02-04 House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback