MN HF2598 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property in self-storage laws regulating liens updated.
Title
Personal property in self-storage laws regulating liens updated.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Barb Yarusso [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Tim Sanders [R] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-29 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2398 |
2014-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |