MN HF2577 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State forecast required to include inflation rate.
Title
State forecast required to include inflation rate.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] |
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Feist and Elkins |
2021-05-03 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-04-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2362 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Taxes