MN HF256 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Author stricken Ecklund.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Author stricken Ecklund.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lead shot limiting rules prohibited.
Title
Lead shot limiting rules prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Author stricken Ecklund. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2017-01-19 | House | Author added Lucero and Backer. |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF263 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance