MN HF2558 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-21 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-21 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student absence from school for religious holidays modified, and employee leave for religious holidays required.
Title
Student absence from school for religious holidays modified, and employee leave for religious holidays required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-21 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-05-01 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2017-04-27 | House | Author added West. |
2017-04-20 | House | Author added Knoblach. |
2017-04-05 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-04-03 | House | Author added Hausman. |
2017-03-31 | House | Author added Masin. |
2017-03-30 | House | Authors added Dehn, R.; Thissen; Moran; Pinto; and Slocum. |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2291 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Authors added Kent; Marty