MN HF2551 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gifted and talented program provisions modified, and funding increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gifted and talented program provisions modified, and funding increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseAuthor added Edelson
2019-05-10HouseAuthors added Sauke, McDonald, and Murphy
2019-05-02HouseAuthor added Bahr
2019-04-26HouseAuthors added Moran, Masin, and Fischer
2019-04-11HouseAuthor added Nornes
2019-04-10HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-03-28HouseAuthors added Her and Xiong, J.
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Carlson, L.
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Education Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2566 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback