MN HF2542 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-17 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota Bond Allocation Act modified relating to housing bonds, manufactured home park lot rentals and sales modified, Housing Finance Agency tax credit allocations modified, eviction cases expungement allowed, residential lease agreement terms mandated, eviction data classified, and housing improvement areas expanded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota Bond Allocation Act modified relating to housing bonds, manufactured home park lot rentals and sales modified, Housing Finance Agency tax credit allocations modified, eviction cases expungement allowed, residential lease agreement terms mandated, eviction data classified, and housing improvement areas expanded.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 85 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Lucero - Amendment - H2542A16 (Y: 58 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Lucero - Amendment - H2542A14 (Y: 58 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Theis - Amendment - H2542A13 (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Theis - Amendment - H2542A12 (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment - A19-0542 (Y: 53 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment - A19-0540 (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment - A19-0539 (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment - A19-0538 (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment - A19-0536 (Y: 59 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment - A19-0535 (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-17SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-17SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-05-06SenateSecond reading
2020-05-06SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
2020-04-30SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2020-04-30SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-05-08SenateSecond reading
2019-05-08SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1644
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1644, now on General Orders
2019-05-07SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-07SenateReceived from House
2019-05-06HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-05-06HouseThird reading as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmended
2019-05-02HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 06, 2019
2019-05-02HouseSecond reading
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-27HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1644 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2542

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2542&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2542&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2542&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2542&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10403
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10404
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10405
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10406
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10407
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10408
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10409
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10410
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10411
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10412
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF2542&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10413
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=7412

Bill Comments

feedback