MN HF2537 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Author added Igo
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Author added Igo
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State required to pay property tax judgement costs against state-assessed property, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
State required to pay property tax judgement costs against state-assessed property, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
Rep. Spencer Igo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Author added Igo |
2021-04-21 | House | Authors added Poston, Grossell and Bliss |
2021-04-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2439 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - Referred to Taxes