MN HF2530 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Novotny
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Novotny
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vaccine passport, vaccine pass, and vaccine credentials for immunization status requirement prohibited.
Title
Vaccine passport, vaccine pass, and vaccine credentials for immunization status requirement prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Novotny |
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Boe, Demuth, Poston, and Daniels |
2021-04-17 | House | Authors added Munson, Mortensen and Bahr |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2610 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Author added Westrom