MN HF2529 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officer authority to stop or detain drivers for motor vehicle equipment violations limited.
Title
Peace officer authority to stop or detain drivers for motor vehicle equipment violations limited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Moran |
2021-04-20 | House | Authors added Reyer and Hornstein |
2021-04-17 | House | Authors added Long, Sandell, Lee, Agbaje, Becker-Finn, Moller and Mortensen |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2462 (Similar To) 2021-05-15 - Authors added Johnson Stewart; Pappas