MN HF2528 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bennett.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bennett.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Identifying and screening patients at risk for colon cancer funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Identifying and screening patients at risk for colon cancer funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Bennett. |
2017-04-18 | House | Authors added Sauke and Knoblach. |
2017-04-07 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-04-06 | House | Authors added Schultz and Kiel. |
2017-04-05 | House | Author added Omar. |
2017-03-30 | House | Authors added Pierson and Pinto. |
2017-03-29 | House | Author added Mariani. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2262 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Author added Clausen