MN HF2527 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Author added Nelson.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Author added Nelson.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Demographer's Office funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
State Demographer's Office funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Author added Nelson. |
2017-04-18 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-03-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1852 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Author added Kent