MN HF2501 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
City and town expenditures for city and town historical societies permitted.
Title
City and town expenditures for city and town historical societies permitted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2019-03-27 | House | Division action, return to Government Operations |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2478 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Taxes