MN HF2500 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Organ harvesting; a resolution calling for the end of Falun Gong practitioners' cold genocide and forced organ harvesting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ harvesting; a resolution calling for the end of Falun Gong practitioners' cold genocide and forced organ harvesting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseAuthor added Moran
2019-04-10HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-04-05HouseAuthors added McDonald and Bahr
2019-04-04HouseAuthors added Hamilton, Scott, Heinrich, and Bernardy
2019-04-03HouseAuthors added Lillie and Bahner
2019-03-28HouseAuthors added Franson and Xiong, T.
2019-03-27HouseAuthors added Masin, Noor, Davnie, Sandstede, Bierman, Zerwas, and Ecklund
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-03-20HouseAuthors added Vang, Urdahl, and Dehn
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-03-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF2416 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Eaton

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback