MN HF2492 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development and housing challenge program; schools added as eligible recipients, and funding requirements added.
Title
Economic development and housing challenge program; schools added as eligible recipients, and funding requirements added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-03-20 | House | Author added Moller |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2023-03-16 | House | Author added Hussein |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2711 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Referred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention