MN HF2472 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Author added Hill
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Author added Hill
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
New program for systemic pesticide-treated seed established, new account in agricultural fund established, and money appropriated.
Title
New program for systemic pesticide-treated seed established, new account in agricultural fund established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Hill |
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1718 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Author added Mitchell