MN HF2462 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Council on LGBTQIA Minnesotans established.
Title
Council on LGBTQIA Minnesotans established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-03-15 | House | Author added Fischer |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Youakim |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2431 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Author added Oumou Verbeten