MN HF246 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Vocational enrichment program established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vocational enrichment program established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Runbeck
2019-03-11HouseReferred by Chair to Education Finance Division
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Daniels
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Lueck and Dettmer
2019-01-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2281 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback