MN HF246 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vocational enrichment program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Vocational enrichment program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Daniels |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Lueck and Dettmer |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2281 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy