MN HF2456 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable chemical and advanced biofuel capital equipment loan program created, advanced biofuel and renewable chemical production incentive programs established, and money appropriated.
Title
Renewable chemical and advanced biofuel capital equipment loan program created, advanced biofuel and renewable chemical production incentive programs established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Author added Persell |
2014-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Author added Falk |
2014-03-10 | House | Author added McNamar |
2014-03-03 | House | Authors added Anderson, P.; Yarusso, and Freiberg |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |