MN HF2453 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gateway Corridor Busway funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Gateway Corridor Busway funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2017-03-28 | House | Author added Ward. |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2344 (Similar To) 2017-04-24 - Referred to Capital Investment