MN HF245 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Daniels
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Daniels
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deputy registrars reimbursement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Deputy registrars reimbursement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Daniels |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Franson, Lueck, Fabian, Dettmer, Scott, and Theis |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF995 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy