MN HF245 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - House: Author added Ward
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - House: Author added Ward
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety radio equipment exemption expanded.
Title
Public safety radio equipment exemption expanded.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Brynaert [D] | Rep. Larry Haws [D] | Rep. Gail Jackson [D] | Rep. Terry Morrow [D] |
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. John Ward [D] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | House: Author added Ward | |
2009-04-01 | House: Author added Jackson | |
2009-03-16 | House: Author added Westrom | |
2009-02-26 | House: Author added Urdahl | |
2009-02-02 | House: Author added Haws | |
2009-01-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0245&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0245.0.pdf |