MN HF2446 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacy Board cease and desist authority granted to prevent the sale of synthetic drugs, misbranded or adulterated drug laws modified, definition expanded, emergency drug scheduling authority sunset and legislative reporting requirement repealed, mandatory restitution provided, public education plan established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Board cease and desist authority granted to prevent the sale of synthetic drugs, misbranded or adulterated drug laws modified, definition expanded, emergency drug scheduling authority sunset and legislative reporting requirement repealed, mandatory restitution provided, public education plan established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-14 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-21 Secretary of State Chapter 285
2014-05-21 Governor's action Approval
2014-05-16 Presented to Governor
2014-05-16HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 55-2
2014-05-15SenateThird reading vote: 55-2
2014-05-15SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2014-05-15SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2014-05-15SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2014-05-14HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 129-0
2014-05-14HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2014-05-14HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2014-05-14HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2014-05-09HouseSenate conferees Reinert, Eaton, Miller
2014-05-09HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2014-05-08HouseHouse conferees Simonson; Ward, J.E.; Lohmer
2014-05-08HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2014-05-08HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2014-05-08SenateSenate conferees Reinert; Eaton; Miller
2014-05-08SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2014-05-08SenateHouse conferees Simonson; Ward, J.E.; Lohmer
2014-05-08SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2014-05-07SenateThird reading Passed vote: 53-1
2014-05-07SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2014-05-02SenateSecond reading
2014-05-02SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2014-04-10SenateReferred to Finance
2014-04-10SenateIntroduction and first reading
2014-04-10SenateReceived from House
2014-04-09HouseBill was passed vote: 130-0
2014-04-09HouseThird reading
2014-04-08HouseAuthor added Sawatzky
2014-04-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 9, 2014
2014-04-02HouseSecond reading
2014-04-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2014-03-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2014-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
2014-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
2014-03-06HouseAuthor added Simon
2014-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2014-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2446&ssn=0&y=2013
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2446&version=0&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2446&version=1&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2446&version=2&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2446&version=3&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2446&version=4&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2446&session_number=0&year=2013&id=830
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2446&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1133

Bill Comments

feedback