MN HF244 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform Electronic Wills Act adopted; and technical, clarifying, and conforming changes made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Electronic Wills Act adopted; and technical, clarifying, and conforming changes made.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - House - House: H.F. NO. 244 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30 Secretary of State Chapter 21
2023-03-30 Governor's action Approval
2023-03-30 Secretary of State, Filed
2023-03-30 Governor approval
2023-03-30 Presented to Governor
2023-03-27HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate
2023-03-27HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2023-03-27HouseMotion prevailed
2023-03-27HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2023-03-27HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2023-03-23HouseHouse rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
2023-03-22SenateThird reading Passed
2023-03-22SenateSpecial Order
2023-03-09SenateSecond reading
2023-03-09SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2023-02-13SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-02-13SenateIntroduction and first reading
2023-02-13SenateReceived from House
2023-02-09HouseBill was passed
2023-02-09HouseThird reading
2023-02-08HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 9, 2023
2023-01-19HouseSecond reading
2023-01-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2023-01-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Same As/Similar To

SF1030 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Author added Kreun

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback