MN HF2430 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger as chief author
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacists required to dispense prescription using an audible container label or braille container label for patients who are visually impaired or blind.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists required to dispense prescription using an audible container label or braille container label for patients who are visually impaired or blind.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28HouseAuthor added Hemmingsen-Jaeger as chief author
2023-03-08HouseAuthor added Agbaje
2023-03-02HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2266 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Author added Mitchell

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback