MN HF2419 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State-administered retirement savings plan report to the legislature required by the commissioner of management and budget, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-administered retirement savings plan report to the legislature required by the commissioner of management and budget, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2014-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs
2014-03-19HouseAuthor added Clark
2014-03-13HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2014-03-10HouseAuthors added Slocum and Loeffler
2014-03-06HouseAuthor added Lillie
2014-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2014-03-03HouseAuthor added Kahn
2014-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback