MN HF2415 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

High-rise sprinkler system grant program established, cities required to report buildings that do not have sprinkler system, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-rise sprinkler system grant program established, cities required to report buildings that do not have sprinkler system, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseAuthor added Sencer-Mura
2023-03-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy
2023-03-20HouseAuthor added Huot
2023-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy
2023-03-02HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2483 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback