MN HF2414 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Masin and Bierman
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Masin and Bierman
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Breast cancer diagnostic services and testing availability and coverage increased.
Title
Breast cancer diagnostic services and testing availability and coverage increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Masin and Bierman |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Edelson |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2320 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy