MN HF2414 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate conferees Benson, Abeler, Utke, Jensen and Marty
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate conferees Benson, Abeler, Utke, Jensen and Marty
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus health and human services finance bill.
Title
Omnibus health and human services finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF THE SPEAKER (Y: 74 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF THE SPEAKER (Y: 76 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Gruenhagen - Amendment - H2414A133 (Y: 56 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Urdahl - Amendment - H2414A151 (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment - H2414A141 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Davids - Amendment - H2414A116 (Y: 47 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Gruenhagen - Amendment - H2414A129 (Y: 3 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Baker - Amendment - H2414A135 (Y: 48 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H2414A159 (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Miller - Amendment - A19-0460 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Drazkowski - Amendment - H2414A94 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H2414A95 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Zerwas and Franson - Amendment - H2414A99 (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H2414A166 (Y: 52 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A181 (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A184 (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A109 (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A100 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment to Franson Amendment - H2414A196 (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Neu - Amendment - H2414a156-1 (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Baker - Amendment - H2414A153-1 (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Neu - Amendment - H2414A148-1 (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Neu - Amendment - H2414A144-1 (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Cantrell - Amendment - A19-0464 (Y: 72 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Albright - Amendment - H2414A130 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF THE SPEAKER (Y: 74 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF THE SPEAKER (Y: 76 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Gruenhagen - Amendment - H2414A133 (Y: 56 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Urdahl - Amendment - H2414A151 (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment - H2414A141 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Davids - Amendment - H2414A116 (Y: 47 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Gruenhagen - Amendment - H2414A129 (Y: 3 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Baker - Amendment - H2414A135 (Y: 48 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H2414A159 (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Miller - Amendment - A19-0460 (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Drazkowski - Amendment - H2414A94 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H2414A95 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Zerwas and Franson - Amendment - H2414A99 (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H2414A166 (Y: 52 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A181 (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A184 (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A109 (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - H2414A100 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Franson - Amendment to Franson Amendment - H2414A196 (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Neu - Amendment - H2414a156-1 (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Baker - Amendment - H2414A153-1 (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Neu - Amendment - H2414A148-1 (Y: 53 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Neu - Amendment - H2414A144-1 (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Cantrell - Amendment - A19-0464 (Y: 72 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Albright - Amendment - H2414A130 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Senate conferees Benson, Abeler, Utke, Jensen and Marty |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2019-05-01 | House | House conferees Liebling, Moran, Schultz, Halverson, Hamilton |
2019-05-01 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-05-01 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate conferees Benson; Abeler; Utke; Jensen; Marty |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | House conferees Liebling; Moran; Schultz; Halverson; Hamilton |
2019-05-01 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2452 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison SF2452, now on General Orders |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Taken from table |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Laid on table |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-25 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken Multiple points of order raised |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to take from table |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2019-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2019-04-05 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2452 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2414