MN HF2404 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boundary Water Canoe Area Wilderness mining restrictions modified.
Title
Boundary Water Canoe Area Wilderness mining restrictions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-05-12 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-04-16 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Xiong, T. |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2436 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - Referred to Mining and Forestry Policy