MN HF2402 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 291
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Omnibus health and human services policy bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus health and human services policy bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-15 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 93 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 86 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-21 Secretary of State Chapter 291
2014-05-21 Governor's action Approval
2014-05-17 Presented to Governor
2014-05-16HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 52-13
2014-05-15SenateThird reading vote: 52-13
2014-05-15SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2014-05-15SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2014-05-15SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2014-05-15HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 93-35
2014-05-15HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2014-05-15HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2014-05-15HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2014-05-09HouseSenate conferees Sheran, Wiklund, Rosen, Lourey, Hayden
2014-05-09HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
2014-05-09HouseHouse conferees Liebling, Loeffler, Halverson, Morgan, Mack
2014-05-09HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2014-05-09HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2014-05-09SenateSenate conferees Sheran; Wiklund; Rosen; Lourey; Hayden
2014-05-09SenateSenate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
2014-05-09SenateHouse conferees Liebling; Loeffler; Halverson; Morgan; Mack
2014-05-09SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2014-05-08SenateThird reading Passed vote: 48-17
2014-05-08SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2014-05-07SenateSecond reading
2014-05-07SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2087
2014-05-06SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2087, now on General Orders
2014-05-06SenateIntroduction and first reading
2014-05-06SenateReceived from House
2014-05-05HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 86-46
2014-05-05HouseThird reading as amended
2014-05-05HousePoint of order raised Multiple points of order raised.
2014-05-05HouseAmended
2014-05-05HouseMotion prevailed
2014-05-05HouseMotion for reconsideration Amendment reconsidered
2014-05-05HouseAmended
2014-05-01HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 5, 2014
2014-04-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 9, 2014
2014-03-31HouseSecond reading
2014-03-31HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2014-03-28HouseAuthor stricken Abeler
2014-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2402&ssn=0&y=2013
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2402&version=0&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2402&version=1&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2402&version=2&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2402&version=3&session=ls88&session_year=2014&session_number=0
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1009
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1010
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1011
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1012
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1016
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1018
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1013
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1015
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1017
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF2402&session_number=0&year=2013&id=1159

Bill Comments

feedback