MN HF239 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Working Parents Act; wage theft protection, paid family leave, and earned sick and safe time provided; fair scheduling required; penalties imposed; reports required; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Working Parents Act; wage theft protection, paid family leave, and earned sick and safe time provided; fair scheduling required; penalties imposed; reports required; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein.
2017-02-02HouseAuthors added Schultz; Bernardy; Johnson, S.; Bly; Hausman.
2017-01-23HouseAuthors added Lee and Clark.
2017-01-19HouseAuthor added Slocum.
2017-01-17HouseAuthors added Moran and Omar.
2017-01-12HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback